MI SB0662 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 0104'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Liquor; licenses; eligibility for club liquor license; extend to certain additional members. Amends sec. 532 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1532).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liquor; licenses; eligibility for club liquor license; extend to certain additional members. Amends sec. 532 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1532).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 48 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateAssigned Pa 0104'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-10SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 4/5/2018 @ 2:54 Pm
2018-04-10SenateApproved By Governor 4/2/2018 @ 12:09 Pm
2018-04-10SenatePresented To Governor 3/27/2018 @ 9:56 Am
2018-03-20SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-03-20SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-03-20SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-03-15HouseTransmitted
2018-03-15HouseInserted Full Title
2018-03-15HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 Yeas 106 Nays 0
2018-03-15HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-14HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-21HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-21HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-01-31HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2018-01-31HouseRead A First Time
2018-01-31HouseReceived On 01/31/2018
2018-01-31SenatePassed Roll Call # 48 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-01-25SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-01-25SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-01-25SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-12-07SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2017-12-07SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-12-07SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-11-28SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2017-11-28SenateIntroduced By Senator Rick Jones

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0662
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0662.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0662.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0662.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0662.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0104.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-07-100.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-01-31-010.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-21-019.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-15-029.htm

Bill Comments

feedback