MI SB0659 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: vehicles, dealers and repair facilities; dealer training conducted by qualified trade organizations; allow as alternative to department-conducted training. Amends sec. 248l of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.248l).
Title
Occupations: vehicles, dealers and repair facilities; dealer training conducted by qualified trade organizations; allow as alternative to department-conducted training. Amends sec. 248l of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.248l).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 353 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 441 (Y: 95 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 222 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 441 (Y: 95 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 222 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 10/16/2020 |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/05/2020 11:36 Am |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 353 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-29 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-09-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 441 Yeas 95 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-24 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-09-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-09-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-06-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-06-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-06-18 | House | Received On 06/18/2020 |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 222 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |