MI SB0652 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0267'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0267'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative procedure; rules; environmental rules; establish a special review committee. Amends secs. 33, 39a, 41, 42, 43, 44, 47 & 48 of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.233 et seq.) & adds secs. 65, 66 & 88. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0653'17
Title
Administrative procedure; rules; environmental rules; establish a special review committee. Amends secs. 33, 39a, 41, 42, 43, 44, 47 & 48 of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.233 et seq.) & adds secs. 65, 66 & 88. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0653'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 532 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 57 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 33 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 57 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 33 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0267'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/29/2018 @ 9:06 Am |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/28/2018 @ 2:45 Pm |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:24 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call # 532 Yeas 25 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | House Substitute H-4 Concurred In |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-05-22 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Title Amended |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 Yeas 57 Nays 51 |
2018-05-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-22 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-22 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2018-05-22 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2018-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-04-11 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-01-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-25 | House | Received On 01/25/2018 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 33 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |