MI SB0643 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property: conveyances; transfer of the Chesterfield Township Veteran Home to the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs; provide for. Creates land transfer act.
Title
Property: conveyances; transfer of the Chesterfield Township Veteran Home to the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs; provide for. Creates land transfer act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 447 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-11-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-11-10 | House | Received On 11/10/2021 |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 447 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Paul Wojno |
Subjects
Property: conveyances
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
State agencies (existing): technology, management, and budget
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
State agencies (existing): technology, management, and budget