MI SB0637 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services
Pending: House Insurance And Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance: reinsurance; innovative waiver for a reinsurance program; provide for. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406nn. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0633'23

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance: reinsurance; innovative waiver for a reinsurance program; provide for. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406nn. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0633'23

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 308 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-26HouseReferred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services
2024-06-26HouseRead A First Time
2024-06-26HouseReceived On 06/26/2024
2024-06-26SenatePassed Roll Call # 308 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2024-06-25SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2024-06-25SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2024-06-25SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2024-03-14SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2024-03-14SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2023-11-01SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2023-11-01SenateIntroduced By Senator Darrin Camilleri

Same As/Similar To

SB0633 (Same As) 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback