MI SB0637 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0162'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Mental health: other; community crisis response grant fund and program; create. Amends 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1001 - 330.2106) by adding secs. 207e & 207f.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health: other; community crisis response grant fund and program; create. Amends 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1001 - 330.2106) by adding secs. 207e & 207f.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 605 (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 396 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-29SenateAssigned Pa 0162'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-12-29SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/27/2021 12:58 Pm
2021-12-29SenateApproved By Governor 12/23/2021 10:46 Am
2021-12-16SenatePresented To Governor 12/16/2021 03:40 Pm
2021-12-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-12-14SenateFull Title Agreed To
2021-12-14SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2021-12-09HouseReturned To Senate
2021-12-09HouseInserted Full Title
2021-12-09HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 605 Yeas 91 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
2021-12-09HouseRead A Third Time
2021-12-08HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-12-08HouseRead A Second Time
2021-12-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-12-02HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-10-20HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2021-10-20HouseRead A First Time
2021-10-20HouseReceived On 10/20/2021
2021-10-20SenatePassed Roll Call # 396 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-10-19SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-10-19SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-10-19SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-10-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2021-10-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-10-19SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-09-14SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2021-09-14SenateIntroduced By Senator Stephanie Chang

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0637
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0637.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0637.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBH-0637.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2021-SNB-0637.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0162.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0637-00B74.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0637-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0637-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0637-1DE2E4AE.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0637-1FE27B6A.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-19-082.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-20-083.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-02-098.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-09-101.htm

Bill Comments

feedback