MI SB0633 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-01 - Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Energy
Pending: House Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-01 - Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Energy
Pending: House Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights: open meetings; procedures for electronic meetings of public bodies; modify. Amends sec. 3a of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.263a).
Title
Civil rights: open meetings; procedures for electronic meetings of public bodies; modify. Amends sec. 3a of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.263a).
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 452 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-01 | House | Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Energy |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-11-30 | House | Received On 11/30/2021 |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 452 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom |