MI SB0632 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0549'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0549'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; probation; procedures for retention and use of nonpublic record of deferral for a controlled substance violation; revise. Amends sec. 7411 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7411).
Title
Criminal procedure; probation; procedures for retention and use of nonpublic record of deferral for a controlled substance violation; revise. Amends sec. 7411 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7411).
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Bieda [D] | Sen. John Gleason [D] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] |
Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. John Proos [R] | Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1027 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 750 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 16 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 750 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 16 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0549'12 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 4:52 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 3:19 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 1:46 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 1027 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed Roll Call # 750 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-01-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-01-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-01-25 | House | Received On 01/25/2012 |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 16 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-10-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-09-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
Subjects
Controlled substances, penalties
Criminal procedure, probation
Law enforcement, records
State agencies (existing), state police
Criminal procedure, probation
Law enforcement, records
State agencies (existing), state police