MI SB0630 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0235'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0235'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; civil infraction procedures; driver license sanctions and reports to the secretary of state for certain violations; revise. Amends sec. 321a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.321a).
Title
Traffic control; civil infraction procedures; driver license sanctions and reports to the secretary of state for certain violations; revise. Amends sec. 321a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.321a).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 567 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 438 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 438 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0235'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2017 @ 1:56 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/20/2017 @ 12:52 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/19/2017 @ 3:34 Pm |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 567 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2017-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-12-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-11-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-01 | House | Received On 11/01/2017 |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 438 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Subjects
Crimes: intoxication or impairment
Liquor: drinking age
State agencies (existing): state
Traffic control: civil infraction procedures
Traffic control: violations
Liquor: drinking age
State agencies (existing): state
Traffic control: civil infraction procedures
Traffic control: violations