MI SB0625 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Pa 0049'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Traffic control; other; workforce training payment program; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 732c.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic control; other; workforce training payment program; create. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 732c.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 86 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 69 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 427 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateAssigned Pa 0049'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-03-06SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 3/1/2018 @ 4:18 Pm
2018-03-06SenateApproved By Governor 3/1/2018 @ 1:36 Pm
2018-02-21SenatePresented To Governor 2/20/2018 @ 3:25 Pm
2018-02-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-02-14SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-02-14SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-02-14Senate Roll Call # 86 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-02-14SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2018-02-14HouseReturned To Senate
2018-02-14HouseInserted Full Title
2018-02-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 69 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2018-02-14HouseRead A Third Time
2018-02-14HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-02-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-02-14HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-02-14HouseRead A Second Time
2018-01-31HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-01-31HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-10-19HouseReferred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
2017-10-19HouseRead A First Time
2017-10-19HouseReceived On 10/19/2017
2017-10-19SenatePassed Roll Call # 427 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2017-10-19SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-10-19SenateRules Suspended
2017-10-19SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2017-10-19SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2017-10-19SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-10-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-10-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-10-12SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-10-10SenateReferred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
2017-10-10SenateIntroduced By Senator Kenneth Horn

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0625
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0625.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0625.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0625.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0625.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-10-12-082.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-10-19-085.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-01-31-010.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-14-016.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-02-14-016.htm

Bill Comments

feedback