MI SB0617 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Assigned Pa 0085'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Crimes: intoxication or impairment; technical changes regarding eliminating sunset for .08 limit; provide for. Amends secs. 625, 625a, 625g & 625m of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0616'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes: intoxication or impairment; technical changes regarding eliminating sunset for .08 limit; provide for. Amends secs. 625, 625a, 625g & 625m of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0616'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 439 (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 344 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-28SenateAssigned Pa 0085'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-09-28SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 09/24/2021 10:52 Am
2021-09-28SenateApproved By Governor 09/24/2021 09:50 Am
2021-09-21SenatePresented To Governor 09/16/2021 02:32 Pm
2021-09-15SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-09-15SenateFull Title Agreed To
2021-09-14HouseReturned To Senate
2021-09-14HouseInserted Full Title
2021-09-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 439 Yeas 101 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
2021-09-14HouseRead A Third Time
2021-09-14HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-09-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-09-14HouseRead A Second Time
2021-09-14HousePlaced On Second Reading
2021-09-14HouseRule Suspended
2021-09-14HouseRead A First Time
2021-09-09HouseReceived On 08/31/2021
2021-08-31SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 344 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-08-31SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-08-31SenateRules Suspended
2021-08-31SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-08-31SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-08-31SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2021-08-31SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2021-08-25SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2021-08-25SenateIntroduced By Senator Roger Victory

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0617
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0617.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0617.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBH-0617.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2021-SNB-0617.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0085.htm
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0616-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0616-C9FA026C.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0616-B4D4660F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0616-F8A524D1.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0616-D9EEAAEC.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-08-31-064.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-09-14-072.htm

Bill Comments

feedback