MI SB0617 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-14 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-14 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; disabilities; brain injury law of Michigan; create. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding pt. 52A.
Title
Health; disabilities; brain injury law of Michigan; create. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding pt. 52A.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 265 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2014-05-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-14 | House | Received On 05/14/2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 265 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator James Marleau |