MI SB0617 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Assigned Pa 0116'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Assigned Pa 0116'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State; other; concurrent jurisdiction on federally owned lands within the Pictured Rocks national lakeshore; provide for. Amends secs. 1 & 4 of 1967 PA 168 (MCL 3.451 & 3.454) & adds secs. 4a, 4b & 4c.
Title
State; other; concurrent jurisdiction on federally owned lands within the Pictured Rocks national lakeshore; provide for. Amends secs. 1 & 4 of 1967 PA 168 (MCL 3.451 & 3.454) & adds secs. 4a, 4b & 4c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 612 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 612 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0116'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/2/2012 @ 1:36 Pm |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/1/2012 @ 9:16 Am |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Presented To Governor 4/25/2012 @ 12:18 Pm |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-04-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-04-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-04-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-11-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2011-11-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-11-01 | House | Received On 11/01/2011 |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 612 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
Same As/Similar To
HB4617 (Same As) 2011-05-05 - Printed Bill Filed 05/05/2011
Subjects
Law enforcement, peace officers
Recreation, other
State agencies (existing), natural resources
State, other
Recreation, other
State agencies (existing), natural resources
State, other