MI SB0611 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0315'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0315'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Libraries: other; release or disclosure of library records to certain persons; allow under certain circumstances. Amends title & secs. 2, 3 & 4 of 1982 PA 455 (MCL 397.602 et seq.).
Title
Libraries: other; release or disclosure of library records to certain persons; allow under certain circumstances. Amends title & secs. 2, 3 & 4 of 1982 PA 455 (MCL 397.602 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 557 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 520 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 319 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 520 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 319 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0315'20 |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 02:42 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2020 10:54 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2020 12:22 Pm |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 557 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-16 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-15 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-15 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 520 Yeas 107 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-12-15 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2020-12-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-15 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-12-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-09-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-09-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-22 | House | Received On 09/22/2020 |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 319 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) As Amended |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) As Amended Concurred In |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) And Amendment(s) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |