MI SB0606 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-05 - Re-referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-05 - Re-referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; certain bridge in village of Oxford; designate as the "Larry Obrecht Bridge". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 14a.
Title
Highways; name; certain bridge in village of Oxford; designate as the "Larry Obrecht Bridge". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 14a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 434 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 434 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-10-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-31 | House | Received On 10/31/2017 |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 434 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Introduced By Senator James Marleau |