MI SB0604 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0258'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0258'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Employment security: benefits; extension of benefits during COVID-19 pandemic; provide for, and create exception from disqualification for victims of domestic violence. Amends secs. 17, 27, 28c, 28d, 29, 32, 32c & 48 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.17 et seq.) & adds sec. 29a.
Title
Employment security: benefits; extension of benefits during COVID-19 pandemic; provide for, and create exception from disqualification for victims of domestic violence. Amends secs. 17, 27, 28c, 28d, 29, 32, 32c & 48 of 1936 (Ex Sess) PA 1 (MCL 421.17 et seq.) & adds sec. 29a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 644 (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 634 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 637 (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 550 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 634 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 637 (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 550 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0258'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 12:48 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2020 10:44 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2020 03:59 Pm |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-21 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-21 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 644 Yeas 98 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute (s-6) To House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In |
2020-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 634 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In As Substituted (s-6) |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Substitute (s-6) Adopted |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 637 Yeas 95 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 9 |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-12-17 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2020-12-16 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-12-16 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-12-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-12-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-12-11 | House | Received On 12/11/2020 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 550 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-5) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-5) Concurred In |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-5) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis Hertel, Jr. |