MI SB0601 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education: other; requirements for public schools concerning the wearing of face masks and certain testing; implement. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1136a & 1136b. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0603'21
Title
Education: other; requirements for public schools concerning the wearing of face masks and certain testing; implement. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1136a & 1136b. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0603'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 406 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 406 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2021-10-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-26 | House | Received On 10/26/2021 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 406 Yeas 19 Nays 15 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Lana Theis |