MI SB0600 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Education: attendance; requirements for public schools concerning certain vaccinations; modify. Amends sec. 1177 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1177) & adds sec. 1177b. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0602'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education: attendance; requirements for public schools concerning certain vaccinations; modify. Amends sec. 1177 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1177) & adds sec. 1177b. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0602'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 405 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26HouseReferred To Committee On Education
2021-10-26HouseRead A First Time
2021-10-26HouseReceived On 10/26/2021
2021-10-26SenatePassed Roll Call # 405 Yeas 19 Nays 15 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2021-10-26SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-10-26SenateRules Suspended
2021-10-26SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-10-26SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-10-26SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-09-15SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-09-15SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-09-15SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-07-27SenateReferred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness
2021-07-27SenateIntroduced By Senator Lana Theis

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback