MI SB0599 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health; pharmaceuticals; allowable amount of ephedrine and pseudoephedrine that may be sold at retail to an individual in a 30-day period; modify. Amends sec. 17766f of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17766f). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0170'19
Title
Health; pharmaceuticals; allowable amount of ephedrine and pseudoephedrine that may be sold at retail to an individual in a 30-day period; modify. Amends sec. 17766f of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17766f). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0170'19
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 70 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-02-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-19 | House | Received On 02/19/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 70 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom |