MI SB0598 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-29 - Defeated Roll Call # 513 Yeas 15 Nays 19 Excused 3 Not Voting 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-29 - Defeated Roll Call # 513 Yeas 15 Nays 19 Excused 3 Not Voting 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health: code; updates regarding the transition from specialty prepaid inpatient health plans to specialty integration plans; provide for. Amends secs. 100d, 116, 151, 153, 165, 202, 204, 204b, 206, 207, 207a, 208, 209a, 209b, 210, 226, 227, 232, 270, 271, 274, 275, 287, 409, 705, 713, 748, 752, 754, 755 & 972 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1100d et seq.); adds secs. 760 & 761 & repeals sec. 269 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1269). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0597'21
Title
Mental health: code; updates regarding the transition from specialty prepaid inpatient health plans to specialty integration plans; provide for. Amends secs. 100d, 116, 151, 153, 165, 202, 204, 204b, 206, 207, 207a, 208, 209a, 209b, 210, 226, 227, 232, 270, 271, 274, 275, 287, 409, 705, 713, 748, 752, 754, 755 & 972 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1100d et seq.); adds secs. 760 & 761 & repeals sec. 269 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1269). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0597'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 513 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-29 | Senate | Defeated Roll Call # 513 Yeas 15 Nays 19 Excused 3 Not Voting 1 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Substitute (s-8) Adopted |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Bizon, M.d. |
Subjects
Health: substance use disorder treatment
Mental health: children
Mental health: code
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Mental health: children
Mental health: code
State agencies (existing): health and human services