MI SB0582 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Pa 0062'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicles; registration; issuance of plates, tabs, or placards to persons with disabilities; allow upon determination of a qualifying condition by a physical therapist. Amends secs. 675, 803d & 803h of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.675 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles; registration; issuance of plates, tabs, or placards to persons with disabilities; allow upon determination of a qualifying condition by a physical therapist. Amends secs. 675, 803d & 803h of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.675 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 98 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 556 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateAssigned Pa 0062'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-03-15SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 3/14/2018 @ 1:12 Pm
2018-03-15SenateApproved By Governor 3/13/2018 @ 11:58 Am
2018-03-07SenatePresented To Governor 3/6/2018 @ 2:00 Pm
2018-02-28SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-02-28SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-02-28SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-02-27HouseReturned To Senate
2018-02-27HouseInserted Full Title
2018-02-27HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 98 Yeas 105 Nays 3
2018-02-27HouseRead A Third Time
2018-02-20HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-02-20HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-06HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-06HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-12-13HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2017-12-13HouseRead A First Time
2017-12-13HouseReceived On 12/13/2017
2017-12-13SenatePassed Roll Call # 556 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2017-12-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-12-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-12-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-12-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-12-12SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-09-20SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation
2017-09-20SenateIntroduced By Senator Marty Knollenberg

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0582
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0582.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0582.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0582.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0582.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0062.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-12-101.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-13-102.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-06-012.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-27-021.htm

Bill Comments

feedback