MI SB0576 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - Assigned Pa 0169'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - Assigned Pa 0169'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco: other; penal code provisions for selling or distributing tobacco products by mail or vending machines; modify age. Amends sec. 42b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.42b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 6108'22, HB 6109'22, SB 0577'21, SB 0720'21
Title
Tobacco: other; penal code provisions for selling or distributing tobacco products by mail or vending machines; modify age. Amends sec. 42b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.42b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 6108'22, HB 6109'22, SB 0577'21, SB 0720'21
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Sen. Ricky Outman [R] | Sen. James Ananich [D] | Sen. Paul Wojno [D] |
Sen. Marshall Bullock [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 364 (Y: 78 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 361 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 361 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0169'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/21/2022 11:14 Am |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/21/2022 09:50 Am |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/11/2022 01:48 Pm |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2022-06-30 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-06-30 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-06-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 364 Yeas 78 Nays 28 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-06-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-06-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-06-30 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-30 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-06-30 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-06-30 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-06-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-06-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-28 | House | Received On 06/23/2022 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 361 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale W. Zorn |