MI SB0567 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 221'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sales tax; exemptions; definition of dental prosthetics; provide for. Amends sec. 1a of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.51a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5173'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax; exemptions; definition of dental prosthetics; provide for. Amends sec. 1a of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.51a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5173'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 521 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 459 (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 359 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-28SenateAssigned Pa 221'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-12-28SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/20/2017 @ 3:22 Pm
2017-12-28SenateApproved By Governor 12/19/2017 @ 8:08 Pm
2017-12-28SenatePresented To Governor 12/19/2017 @ 10:20 Am
2017-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-12-13SenateFull Title Agreed To
2017-12-13SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-12-13Senate Roll Call # 521 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2017-12-13SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2017-12-12HouseReturned To Senate
2017-12-12HouseInserted Full Title
2017-12-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 459 Yeas 98 Nays 11
2017-12-12HouseRead A Third Time
2017-11-08HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-11-08HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2017-11-08HouseRead A Second Time
2017-10-25HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-10-25HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-10-04HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2017-10-04HouseRead A First Time
2017-10-04HouseReceived On 10/04/2017
2017-10-04SenatePassed Roll Call # 359 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2017-10-03SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2017-10-03SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2017-10-03SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-09-26SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-09-26SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-09-26SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-09-13SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2017-09-13SenateIntroduced By Senator Dale Zorn

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0567
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0567.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0567.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0567.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0567.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0221.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-09-26-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-10-04-078.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-25-082.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-12-12-096.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-13-102.htm

Bill Comments

feedback