MI SB0565 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0387'16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0387'16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for the receipt of compensation for the distribution or transfer of embryo, fetus, or neonate, including portions obtained as the result of an elective abortion; enact. Amends sec. 13k, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13k).
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for the receipt of compensation for the distribution or transfer of embryo, fetus, or neonate, including portions obtained as the result of an elective abortion; enact. Amends sec. 13k, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13k).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 807 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 689 (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 197 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 689 (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 197 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0387'16 |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2016 @ 1:34 Pm |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2016 @ 10:42 Am 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/28/2016 @ 9:15 Am |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 807 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 689 Yeas 68 Nays 39 |
2016-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-04-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-04-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2016-04-27 | House | Received On 04/27/2016 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 197 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Phillip Pavlov |