MI SB0564 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming: bingo and charitable gaming; millionaire party licenses; modify. Amends secs. 34 & 41 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.134 & 432.141).
Title
Gaming: bingo and charitable gaming; millionaire party licenses; modify. Amends secs. 34 & 41 of 1972 PA 382 (MCL 432.134 & 432.141).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 8 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-01-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-01-20 | House | Received On 01/20/2022 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 8 Yeas 23 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael D. Macdonald |