MI SB0544 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Education Reform
Pending: House Education Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Individual income tax; other; enhanced Michigan education savings program; create. Amends title of 2000 PA 161 (MCL 390.1471 - 390.1486) & adds pt. 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual income tax; other; enhanced Michigan education savings program; create. Amends title of 2000 PA 161 (MCL 390.1471 - 390.1486) & adds pt. 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 474 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-05HouseReferred To Committee On Education Reform
2017-12-05HouseRead A First Time
2017-12-05HouseReceived On 12/05/2017
2017-12-05SenatePassed Roll Call # 474 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2017-11-30SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2017-11-30SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2017-11-30SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2017-09-20SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2017-09-20SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-09-20SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-09-12SenateReferred To Committee On Education
2017-09-12SenateIntroduced By Senator Patrick Colbeck

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback