MI SB0539 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Presented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:40 Am
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Human services; children's services; criminal history check for child caring institution staff and retention of certain data; update as required by the federal families first prevention services act. Amends secs. 5, 5d & 5k of 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.115 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human services; children's services; criminal history check for child caring institution staff and retention of certain data; update as required by the federal families first prevention services act. Amends secs. 5, 5d & 5k of 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.115 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 4 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 250 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenatePresented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:40 Am
2020-01-09SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-01-09SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2020-01-09SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-01-09SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 4 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2020-01-09SenateHouse Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
2020-01-08HouseReturned To Senate
2020-01-08HouseTitle Amended
2020-01-08HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2020-01-08HouseRead A Third Time
2019-12-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-12-11HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2019-12-11HouseRead A Second Time
2019-12-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-12-10HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-11-06HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2019-10-16HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2019-10-16HouseRead A First Time
2019-10-16HouseReceived On 10/16/2019
2019-10-16SenatePassed Roll Call # 250 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-10-08SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-10-08SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-10-03SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-10-03SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-10-03SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-10-02SenateReferred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
2019-10-02SenateIntroduced By Senator John Bizon, M.d.

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0539
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0539.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0539.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0539.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-10-03-093.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-10-16-097.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-12-10-113.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-01-08-001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-01-09-002.htm

Bill Comments

feedback