MI SB0536 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of I-94 in Wayne County; designate as the "Firefighter Coleman A. Tate Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2083) by adding sec. 1070a.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of I-94 in Wayne County; designate as the "Firefighter Coleman A. Tate Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2083) by adding sec. 1070a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 651 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 345 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 345 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2020-12-21 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-21 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 651 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-12-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-21 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2020-12-21 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2020-09-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-24 | House | Received On 09/24/2020 |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 345 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Adam J. Hollier |