MI SB0529 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations: supplemental; bridge repair and replace supplemental; provide for. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations: supplemental; bridge repair and replace supplemental; provide for. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 339 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-07-21HouseRead A First Time
2021-07-21HouseReceived On 07/15/2021
2021-07-15SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2021-07-15SenatePassed Roll Call # 339 Yeas 23 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-07-15SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2021-07-15SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-07-15SenateRules Suspended
2021-07-15SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-07-15SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-07-15SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-07-15SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2021-07-15SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2021-06-09SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-06-09SenateIntroduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt
2021-07-15SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback