MI SB0527 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 0011'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 0011'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; Beacon Boulevard in Grand Haven; designate as the "Officer Scott Flahive Memorial Highway". Amends sec. 11 of 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1011) & adds sec. 11c.
Title
Highways: memorial; Beacon Boulevard in Grand Haven; designate as the "Officer Scott Flahive Memorial Highway". Amends sec. 11 of 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1011) & adds sec. 11c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 11 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 287 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 287 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0011'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/27/2020 03:14 Pm |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 01/24/2020 10:51 Am |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:42 Am |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-01-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 11 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |