MI SB0522 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Pa 0061'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Pa 0061'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; other; compensation for directors of a village or township community center; provide for. Amends sec. 3 of 1929 PA 199 (MCL 123.43).
Title
Local government; other; compensation for directors of a village or township community center; provide for. Amends sec. 3 of 1929 PA 199 (MCL 123.43).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 108 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 10 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 10 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0061'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/14/2018 @ 1:10 Pm |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Approved By Governor 3/13/2018 @ 12:01 Pm |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Presented To Governor 3/6/2018 @ 2:02 Pm |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 108 Yeas 104 Nays 5 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2018-01-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-17 | House | Received On 01/17/2018 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 10 Yeas 30 Nays 7 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |
Subjects
Local government: other
Townships: boards and commissions
Townships: employees and officers
Villages: boards and commissions
Villages: employees and officers
Townships: boards and commissions
Townships: employees and officers
Villages: boards and commissions
Villages: employees and officers