MI SB0516 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-11 - Notice Given To Discharge Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-11 - Notice Given To Discharge Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; agricultural equipment; definition of modified agriculture vehicle; create, and provide an exception from certain weight requirements. Amends secs. 627, 688, 722 & 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.627 et seq.) & adds sec. 30c.
Title
Vehicles; agricultural equipment; definition of modified agriculture vehicle; create, and provide an exception from certain weight requirements. Amends secs. 627, 688, 722 & 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.627 et seq.) & adds sec. 30c.
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] | Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] |
Sen. Joseph Hune [R] | Sen. Phillip Pavlov [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 702 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-11 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2011-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2011-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2011 |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 702 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |