MI SB0512 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 4 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Presented To Governor 12/10/2018 @ 11:46 Am
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Individual income tax; deductions; tax incentive for contributions made to first-time home buyers program; provide for. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0511'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual income tax; deductions; tax incentive for contributions made to first-time home buyers program; provide for. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0511'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 656 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 655 (Y: 89 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 541 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-11SenatePresented To Governor 12/10/2018 @ 11:46 Am
2018-12-04SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-12-04SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2018-12-04SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-12-04Senate Roll Call # 656 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-12-04SenateHouse Substitute H-2 Concurred In
2018-11-29HouseReturned To Senate
2018-11-29HouseTitle Amended
2018-11-29HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 655 Yeas 89 Nays 20
2018-11-29HouseRead A Third Time
2018-11-28HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-11-28HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2018-11-28HouseSubstitute H-1 Not Adopted
2018-11-28HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-02HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-12-13HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2017-12-13HouseRead A First Time
2017-12-13HouseReceived On 12/13/2017
2017-12-13SenatePassed Roll Call # 541 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2017-12-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2017-12-12SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2017-12-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-11-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2017-11-09SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-11-09SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-07-12SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2017-07-12SenateIntroduced By Senator Kenneth Horn

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0512
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0512.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0512.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0512.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0512.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-11-09-094.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-13-102.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-02-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-11-29-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-04-074.htm

Bill Comments

feedback