MI SB0510 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-19 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-19 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; intoxication or impairment; abstract of court record for certain violations of the minor in possession of alcohol statute; revise. Amends sec. 732 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732).
Title
Crimes; intoxication or impairment; abstract of court record for certain violations of the minor in possession of alcohol statute; revise. Amends sec. 732 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 340 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-09-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-19 | House | Received On 09/19/2017 |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 340 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Subjects
Courts: records
Crimes: intoxication or impairment
Juveniles: other
Liquor: drinking age
State agencies (existing): state
Crimes: intoxication or impairment
Juveniles: other
Liquor: drinking age
State agencies (existing): state