MI SB0505 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0252'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0252'23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for certain Michigan election law violations dealing with intimidating an election official; provide for. Amends sec. 11d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.11d).
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for certain Michigan election law violations dealing with intimidating an election official; provide for. Amends sec. 11d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.11d).
Sponsors
Sen. Dayna Polehanki [D] | Sen. Sean McCann [D] | Sen. Erika Geiss [D] | Sen. Sue Shink [D] |
Sen. Rosemary Bayer [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 540 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 644 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 644 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-29 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0252'23 |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/01/2023 11:04 Am |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/30/2023 12:18 Pm |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/21/2023 10:46 Am |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-11-09 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-11-09 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2023-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 540 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-11-08 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2023-11-08 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2023-11-07 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2023-11-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-11-02 | House | Received On 11/02/2023 |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 644 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended For Immediate Consideration |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2023-09-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dayna Polehanki |
Same As/Similar To
HB4129 (Same As) 2023-12-31 - Assigned Pa 253'23