MI SB0499 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Human services: medical services; access to quality complex rehabilitation technology; provide for. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0500'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human services: medical services; access to quality complex rehabilitation technology; provide for. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0500'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 68 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-09HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2022-03-09HouseRead A First Time
2022-03-09HouseReceived On 03/09/2022
2022-03-09SenatePassed Roll Call # 68 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2022-03-08SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2022-03-08SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2022-03-08SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2021-10-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2021-10-12SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-06-02SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2021-06-02SenateIntroduced By Senator Kevin Daley

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0499
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0499.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0499.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0499-00B74.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0499-00C76.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0499-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0499-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0499-B.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0499-1AD7E98A.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-12-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-03-09-024.htm

Bill Comments

feedback