MI SB0486 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation
Pending: House Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation
Pending: House Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: hunting; membership on the wolf management advisory council; modify. Amends sec. 43540e of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43540e).
Title
Natural resources: hunting; membership on the wolf management advisory council; modify. Amends sec. 43540e of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43540e).
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 260 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2021-06-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-10 | House | Received On 06/10/2021 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 260 Yeas 19 Nays 16 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom |