MI SB0484 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Assigned Pa 0074'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Assigned Pa 0074'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Disabilities; other; fees for licensing interpreters; deposit in division on deafness fund. Amends 1982 PA 204 (MCL 393.501 - 393.509) by adding sec. 8f. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5672'09
Title
Disabilities; other; fees for licensing interpreters; deposit in division on deafness fund. Amends 1982 PA 204 (MCL 393.501 - 393.509) by adding sec. 8f. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5672'09
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Jansen [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Assigned Pa 0074'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-05-20 | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/19/2010 @ 1:17 Pm | |
2010-05-20 | Approved By Governor 5/19/2010 @ 12:02 Pm | |
2010-05-12 | Presented To Governor 5/11/2010 @ 12:16 Pm | |
2010-05-06 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-05-06 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-05-06 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-05-06 | Roll Call # 227 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-05-06 | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In | |
2010-05-06 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-05-05 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-05-05 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 173 Yeas 103 Nays 0 | |
2010-05-05 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-05-05 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-05-05 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-05-05 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2010-05-05 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-04-28 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-04-28 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-08-19 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2009-08-19 | Read A First Time | |
2009-08-19 | Received On 08/19/2009 | |
2009-08-19 | Passed Roll Call # 396 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-08-18 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2009-08-18 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-08-18 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-08-18 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-08-18 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-04-28 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
Subjects
Disabilities, other
Occupations, individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth
Occupations, individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth