MI SB0479 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 0265'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Occupations; code; technical changes to reflect repeal of certain licensing and registration requirements; enact. Amends secs. 303a & 411 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.303a & 339.411).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupations; code; technical changes to reflect repeal of certain licensing and registration requirements; enact. Amends secs. 303a & 411 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.303a & 339.411).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 478 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 478 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 285 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 447 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-16SenateAssigned Pa 0265'14 With Immediate Effect
2014-07-16SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 7/1/2014 @ 1:14 Pm
2014-07-16SenateApproved By Governor 6/26/2014 @ 4:44 Pm
2014-07-16SenatePresented To Governor 6/25/2014 @ 3:44 Pm
2014-06-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2014-06-12SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2014-06-12SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2014-06-12Senate Roll Call # 478 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2014-06-12SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2014-05-27SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2014-05-27SenateHouse Amended Title
2014-05-22HouseReturned To Senate
2014-05-22HouseTitle Amended
2014-05-22HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 285 Yeas 104 Nays 6
2014-05-22HouseRead A Third Time
2014-05-21HousePlaced On Third Reading
2014-05-21HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2014-05-21HouseRead A Second Time
2014-05-14HouseReferred To Second Reading
2014-05-14HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2013-10-23HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2013-10-23HouseRead A First Time
2013-10-23HouseReceived On 10/23/2013
2013-10-23SenatePassed Roll Call # 447 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2013-10-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2013-10-22SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2013-10-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2013-10-15SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2013-10-15SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2013-10-15SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2013-09-11SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2013-09-11SenateIntroduced By Senator Mark Jansen

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2013-SB-0479
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2013-SIB-0479.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2013-SEBS-0479.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2013-SEBH-0479.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2013-SNB-0479.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/publicact/htm/2014-PA-0265.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2013-SJ-10-15-082.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2013-SJ-10-23-086.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-05-14-045.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-05-22-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-06-12-057.htm

Bill Comments

feedback