MI SB0475 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Assigned Pa 0157'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Assigned Pa 0157'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School aid: foundation allowance; reference to basic foundation allowance in revenue estimating conference; change to target foundation allowance. Amends sec. 367b of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1367b).
Title
School aid: foundation allowance; reference to basic foundation allowance in revenue estimating conference; change to target foundation allowance. Amends sec. 367b of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1367b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 362 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 237 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 237 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0157'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 09/17/2020 11:44 Am |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Approved By Governor 09/17/2020 10:29 Am |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Presented To Governor 09/14/2020 01:00 Pm |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-09 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-09-09 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 362 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-09-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-24 | House | Received On 09/24/2019 |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 237 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |