MI SB0460 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities; emergency medical services; reporting requirements for the Michigan Emergency Medical Services Information System; exempt certain life support agencies. Amends secs. 20904 & 20910 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20904 & 333.20910).
Title
Health facilities; emergency medical services; reporting requirements for the Michigan Emergency Medical Services Information System; exempt certain life support agencies. Amends secs. 20904 & 20910 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20904 & 333.20910).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 231 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-09-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-24 | House | Received On 09/24/2019 |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 231 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Adopted |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Aric Nesbitt |
Subjects
Health facilities: emergency medical services
Health: emergency services
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health: emergency services
State agencies (existing): health and human services