MI SB0459 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-25 - Assigned Pa 0070'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-25 - Assigned Pa 0070'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: neighborhood enterprise zones; filing of neighborhood enterprise zone certificate; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.774).
Title
Economic development: neighborhood enterprise zones; filing of neighborhood enterprise zone certificate; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.774).
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Moss [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 374 (Y: 90 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 229 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 229 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-25 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0070'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/29/2021 11:08 Am |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/29/2021 09:34 Am |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/21/2021 10:46 Am |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2021-06-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-06-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2021-06-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 374 Yeas 90 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-06-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2021-05-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-26 | House | Received On 05/26/2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 229 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jeremy Moss |