MI SB0452 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicles: other; fee for certain records; provide for. Amends sec. 232 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.232).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: other; fee for certain records; provide for. Amends sec. 232 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.232).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 458 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2022-05-03HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-12-02HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation
2021-12-02HouseRead A First Time
2021-12-02HouseReceived On 12/02/2021
2021-12-02SenatePassed Roll Call # 458 Yeas 20 Nays 14 Excused 4 Not Voting 0
2021-12-01SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-12-01SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-10-28SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-10-28SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-10-28SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-05-18SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2021-05-18SenateIntroduced By Senator Roger Victory

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0452
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0452.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0452.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0452-0N2914.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0452-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0452-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0452-32ECA143.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0452-116439DF.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0452-U.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0452-CC28E137.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0452-EF08B558.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-28-087.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-12-02-095.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2022-HJ-05-03-038.htm

Bill Comments

feedback