MI SB0450 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0274'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0274'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health: diseases; issuing an emergency order in response to an epidemic that limits visitation in certain health facilities; prohibit under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 2253 & 2453 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2253 & 333.2453).
Title
Health: diseases; issuing an emergency order in response to an epidemic that limits visitation in certain health facilities; prohibit under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 2253 & 2453 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2253 & 333.2453).
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Sen. Kimberly LaSata [R] | Sen. Ruth Johnson [R] | Sen. James Runestad [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 495 (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 229 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 229 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0274'22 |
2022-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2022 01:40 Pm |
2022-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2022 01:02 Pm |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2022 01:35 Pm |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-12-07 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-12-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 495 Yeas 93 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 12 |
2022-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-11-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2022-05-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-05-11 | House | Received On 05/11/2022 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 229 Yeas 33 Nays 0 Excused 5 Not Voting 0 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Adopted |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2022-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |
Subjects
Health facilities: patients
Health: diseases
Health: local health departments
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health: diseases
Health: local health departments
State agencies (existing): health and human services