MI SB0449 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; other; definition of regularly employed; clarify in commission on law enforcement standards act and allow for certain waivers. Amends secs. 2 & 9 of 1965 PA 203 (MCL 28.602 & 28.609).
Title
Law enforcement; other; definition of regularly employed; clarify in commission on law enforcement standards act and allow for certain waivers. Amends secs. 2 & 9 of 1965 PA 203 (MCL 28.602 & 28.609).
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Birkholz [R] | Sen. Cameron Brown [R] | Sen. Bill Hardiman [R] | Sen. Mark Jansen [R] |
Sen. Wayne Kuipers [R] | Sen. John Pappageorge [R] | Sen. Randy Richardville [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-30 | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) | |
2009-06-25 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-06-25 | Read A First Time | |
2009-06-25 | Received On 06/25/2009 | |
2009-06-25 | Passed Roll Call # 365 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-06-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-25 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-06-25 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-6 | |
2009-06-25 | Substitute S-6 Concurred In | |
2009-06-25 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-6 | |
2009-06-04 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-06-04 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-06-04 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-04-22 | Reassigned To Committee On Homeland Security And Emerging Technologies | |
2009-04-21 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |