MI SB0440 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Assigned Pa 0035'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health facilities: certificate of need; certain PET scanners; exempt from certificate of need regulations. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 22224b.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health facilities: certificate of need; certain PET scanners; exempt from certificate of need regulations. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 22224b.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 325 (Y: 82 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 228 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24SenateAssigned Pa 0035'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-06-24SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 06/24/2021 11:08 Am
2021-06-24SenateApproved By Governor 06/24/2021 08:23 Am
2021-06-23SenatePresented To Governor 06/22/2021 10:36 Am
2021-06-16SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-06-16SenateFull Title Agreed To
2021-06-16SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2021-06-10HouseReturned To Senate
2021-06-10HouseInserted Full Title
2021-06-10HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 325 Yeas 82 Nays 27 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2021-06-10HouseRead A Third Time
2021-06-09HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-06-09HouseRead A Second Time
2021-06-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-06-03HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-05-26HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2021-05-26HouseRead A First Time
2021-05-26HouseReceived On 05/26/2021
2021-05-26SenatePassed Roll Call # 228 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-05-25SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-05-25SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-05-25SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-05-25SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2021-05-25SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-05-25SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-05-12SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2021-05-12SenateIntroduced By Senator Winnie Brinks

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0440
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0440.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0440.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBH-0440.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2021-SNB-0440.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0035.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0440-00B74.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0440-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0440-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0440-87E82027.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0440-A5BECE9D.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0440-586AA93A.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-05-25-047.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-05-26-048.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-03-052.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-10-055.htm

Bill Comments 750

feedback