MI SB0440 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Assigned Pa 155'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Assigned Pa 155'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; other; reference to grape and wine council; revise to reflect change in name to the Michigan craft beverage council and to create a fund for it to carry out its responsibilities. Amends secs. 221 & 543 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1221 & 436.1543) & adds sec. 303a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4667'17
Title
Liquor; other; reference to grape and wine council; revise to reflect change in name to the Michigan craft beverage council and to create a fund for it to carry out its responsibilities. Amends secs. 221 & 543 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1221 & 436.1543) & adds sec. 303a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4667'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 280 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 268 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 12 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 268 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 12 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Assigned Pa 155'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/23/2018 @ 2:28 Pm |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/23/2018 @ 12:42 Pm |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/11/2018 @ 3:29 Pm |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll Call # 280 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2018-05-08 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-08 | House | Title Amended |
2018-05-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 268 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2018-05-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-05-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-01-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-17 | House | Received On 01/17/2018 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 12 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Goeffrey Hansen |