MI SB0439 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Assigned Pa 0069'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Businesses; nonprofit corporations; annual report fees under the nonprofit corporation act; modify. Amends sec. 1060 of 1982 PA 162 (MCL 450.3060).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Businesses; nonprofit corporations; annual report fees under the nonprofit corporation act; modify. Amends sec. 1060 of 1982 PA 162 (MCL 450.3060).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 177 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-02SenateAssigned Pa 0069'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-10-02SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 09/30/2019 07:44 Pm
2019-10-02SenateApproved By Governor 09/30/2019 10:30 Am
2019-09-24SenatePresented To Governor 09/24/2019 01:53 Pm
2019-09-19SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-29SenateFull Title Agreed To
2019-09-18HouseReturned To Senate
2019-09-18HouseInserted Full Title
2019-09-18HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 211 Yeas 108 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-09-18HouseRead A Third Time
2019-09-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-09-12HouseRead A Second Time
2019-09-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-09-11HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-08-29HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-08-29HouseRead A First Time
2019-08-29HouseReceived On 08/29/2019
2019-08-29SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 177 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-08-29SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-08-29SenateRules Suspended
2019-08-29SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-08-29SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-08-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-08-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-08-29SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-08-20SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-08-20SenateIntroduced By Senator Adam J. Hollier

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback