MI SB0439 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; economic development; grape and wine industry council; change name to Michigan craft beverage council and revise powers and duties of members. Amends sec. 303 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1303). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0440'17
Title
Liquor; economic development; grape and wine industry council; change name to Michigan craft beverage council and revise powers and duties of members. Amends sec. 303 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1303). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0440'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 11 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-01-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-17 | House | Received On 01/17/2018 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 11 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Goeffrey Hansen |