MI SB0436 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 162'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 162'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; drug court; certification of DWI/sobriety court by the state court administrative office; amend the vehicle code to reflect. Amends sec. 304 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.304). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0435'17, SB 0437'17, SB 0438'17
Title
Courts; drug court; certification of DWI/sobriety court by the state court administrative office; amend the vehicle code to reflect. Amends sec. 304 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.304). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0435'17, SB 0437'17, SB 0438'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 (Y: 99 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 330 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 330 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 162'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/13/2017 @ 9:56 Am |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/9/2017 @ 11:21 Am |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/7/2017 @ 3:18 Pm |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-10-26 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-10-26 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2017-10-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 331 Yeas 99 Nays 7 |
2017-10-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-09-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-09-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-12 | House | Received On 09/12/2017 |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 330 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tonya Schuitmaker |